NM SB121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 155 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 155 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dept. Of Transportation Livestock Fencing
Title
Dept. Of Transportation Livestock Fencing
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 155 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:56 N:4 |
2019-03-08 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-05 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HTPWC |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |