NM SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Gov't Behavioral Health Clinic Funding
Title
Local Gov't Behavioral Health Clinic Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-24 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |