NM SB135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 244 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 244 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naturopathic Doctors' Practice Act
Title
Naturopathic Doctors' Practice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 244 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:1 |
2019-03-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |