NM SB136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-10 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-10 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Amendments
Title
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-03 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-24 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HSEIC |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:14 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-02-18 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |