NM SB140 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery Scholarship Awards & Tuition Costs
Title
Lottery Scholarship Awards & Tuition Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70 |
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (34-1) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |