NM SB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Associations Changes
Title
Homeowner Associations Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 4 |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:10 |
2019-01-29 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |