NM SB172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Suicide Awareness & Prevention
Title
School Suicide Awareness & Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=172&year=18 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/18%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0172.pdf |