NM SB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jury Affidavit Exemption If Over Age 75
Title
Jury Affidavit Exemption If Over Age 75
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-06 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-03 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |