NM SB175 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Affairs Changes
Title
Military Affairs Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-16 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SJC |