NM SB190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 226 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 226 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Intimate Partner Violence Survivor Suffrage
Title
Intimate Partner Violence Survivor Suffrage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 226 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HSEIC |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |