NM SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 94 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 94 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require Certain Overdose Counselings
Title
Require Certain Overdose Counselings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 94 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:28 |
2019-03-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-27 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:8 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | multiple floor amendments |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |