NM SB226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Daylight Saving Time
Title
Permanent Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:17 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |