NM SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 96 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Additional Unlawful Discrimination Practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional Unlawful Discrimination Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 96 - Mar. 28
2019-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0
2019-03-11HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08HouseHLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-01HouseSent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC
2019-02-27SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
2019-02-26SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-14SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback