NM SB244 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legal Services For Land Grants & Acequias
Title
Legal Services For Land Grants & Acequias
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Feb. 4 |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:1 |
2019-01-30 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |