NM SB246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 53 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 53 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Quality Surcharge Act
Title
Health Care Quality Surcharge Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 53 - Mar. 14 |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-01 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |