NM SB247 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher Evaluation Act
Title
Teacher Evaluation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to: HEC |
2019-03-11 | House | re |
2019-03-11 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-03 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HEC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-30 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SPAC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |