NM SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 214 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 214 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Differential Pricing Based On Gender
Title
No Differential Pricing Based On Gender
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 214 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:18 |
2019-03-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-06 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |