NM SB279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Income Tax Deductions
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=279&year=18 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/18%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0279.pdf |