NM SB294 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 266 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 266 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Exchange Board Reporting
Title
Health Insurance Exchange Board Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 266 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:18 |
2019-03-13 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |