NM SB30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Capital Outlay Funding Formula
Title
Change Capital Outlay Funding Formula
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 66 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (63-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Education |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Education |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (29-13) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Floor amendment adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |