NM SB325 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Collateral Consequences Of Conviction
Title
Uniform Collateral Consequences Of Conviction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-15 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |