NM SB326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Project Fund Projects
Title
Water Project Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Mar. 27 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC |