NM SB337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 227 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 227 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surprise Billing Protection Act
Title
Surprise Billing Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 227 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-10 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |