NM SB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Indoor E-cigarette Use
Title
No Indoor E-cigarette Use
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Sen. Nancy Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Clemente Sanchez [D] |
Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Stefanics [D] | Sen. Mimi Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-13 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-10 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:7 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |