NM SB354 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 255 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 255 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Coverage Via Telemedicine
Title
Health Coverage Via Telemedicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 255 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:1 |
2019-03-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |