NM SB397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anonymity Of Lottery Winners
Title
Anonymity Of Lottery Winners
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:2 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |