NM SB42 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Missing Person Notification Requirements
Title
Missing Person Notification Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 14 |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |