NM SB438 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 169 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 169 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Acequia & Community Ditch Infrastructure Fund
Title
Acequia & Community Ditch Infrastructure Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 169 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:3 |
2019-03-11 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC |