NM SB439 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Educational Retirement Board Membership
Title
Educational Retirement Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SPAC |