NM SB46 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naming Of Public Facilities
Title
Naming Of Public Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 13 |
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (62-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] HSIVC |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] HSIVC |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |