NM SB472 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhanced E911 Consultation
Title
Enhanced E911 Consultation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2019-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-15 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-13 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:1 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC |