NM SB473 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform money services act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform money services act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18House[LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
2015-03-18House[LD 42] Referred to House Judiciary
2015-03-18House[LD 42] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-13House[LD 39] HGEIC
2015-03-13House[LD 39] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2015-03-13Senate[LD 39] Passed Senate (28-1)
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-02-02Senate[LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2015-02-02Senate[LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback