NM SB473 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 170 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Additional Investment Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional Investment Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 170 - Apr. 2
2019-03-15SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2019-03-14HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
2019-03-11HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-08HouseSent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC
2019-03-07SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:33 N:2
2019-03-06SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-27SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-05SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback