NM SB48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Diabetes Management Act
Title
Student Diabetes Management Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 4 |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:19 |
2019-01-29 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:10 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-01-22 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |