NM SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate Stream Commission Membership
Title
Interstate Stream Commission Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:16 |
2019-03-13 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-03 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:10 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |