NM SB533 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 171 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 171 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mesilla Valley Bosque Park Land Transfer
Title
Mesilla Valley Bosque Park Land Transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 171 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-08 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |