NM SB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 151 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 151 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Coyote Killing Contests
Title
Prohibit Coyote Killing Contests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 151 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:30 |
2019-03-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:22 N:17 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |