NM SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 152 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 152 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senior Center Food Gardens
Title
Senior Center Food Gardens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 152 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:0 |
2019-03-07 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-28 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCONC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |