NM SJM1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"alzheimer's Disease Awareness Day"
Title
"alzheimer's Disease Awareness Day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-01 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-01-21 | Senate | tabled temporarily by motion in Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |