NM SJM11 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Address Institutional Racism
Title
Address Institutional Racism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (20-7) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |