NM SJM14 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study grandparents raising grandchildren
Title
Study grandparents raising grandchildren
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | [LD 14] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (70-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (26-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |