NM SJM2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commit To Elimination Of Achievement Gap
Title
Commit To Elimination Of Achievement Gap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:56 N:0 |
2019-03-06 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |