NM SJR3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Jurisdiction Of National Park Units
Title
Transfer Jurisdiction Of National Park Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:17 |
2019-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:5 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |