NM SJR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer Of Probate Court Jurisdiction, Ca

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer Of Probate Court Jurisdiction, Ca

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-09HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HJC
2019-03-08SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:29 N:9
2019-03-02SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-22SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-21SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback