NM SM106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic Violence Response Teams

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Response Teams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseSigned by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
2019-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0
2019-03-10SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-28SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback