NM SM38 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans remembered flag in cemeteries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans remembered flag in cemeteries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-14 [LD 21] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses.
2012-02-13 [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-07 [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2012-02-07 [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Referred to Senate Rules
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback