NM SM38 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-11 - [LD 26] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic Violence Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-11House[LD 26] Signed by one or both houses
2017-02-08Senate[LD 23] Passed Senate (31-0)
2017-02-05Senate[LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-30Senate[LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2017-01-30Senate[LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Referred to Senate Rules
2017-01-24Senate[LD 8] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback