NM SM55 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana & Opioid Use Disorder
Title
Medical Marijuana & Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (36-1) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |