NM SM6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-03 - [LD 11] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-03 - [LD 11] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"eating Disorders Awareness Week"
Title
"eating Disorders Awareness Week"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-01 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Not Referred to Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |