NM SM96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Services For Victims Of Human Trafficking
Title
Services For Victims Of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Candelaria [D] | Sen. Clemente Sanchez [D] | Sen. Benny Shendo [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Stefanics [D] |
Sen. Bill Tallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (22-0) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |